TX SB1085 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification of unopposed candidates for the board of directors of the North Harris County Regional Water Authority.
Title
Relating to the certification of unopposed candidates for the board of directors of the North Harris County Regional Water Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1472 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
NORTH HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Elections--General
NORTH HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility