TX SB1066 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to meeting the graduate medical education needs of new medical degree programs offered by public institutions of higher education and to the employment status of certain residents participating in certain graduate medical education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to meeting the graduate medical education needs of new medical degree programs offered by public institutions of higher education and to the employment status of certain residents participating in certain graduate medical education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1631 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-22HousePostponed
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-28SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-28SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-23SenateFiled
2017-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback