TX SB1065 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to civil racketeering; providing civil penalties.
Title
Relating to civil racketeering; providing civil penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed | |
2009-02-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1618 (Same As) 2009-04-07 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Property
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Property
Crimes--Miscellaneous