TX SB1064 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the investigation of child abuse or neglect.
Title
Relating to the investigation of child abuse or neglect.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Rose [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed | |
2009-02-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |