TX SB1052 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain retail installment contracts and leases for vehicles; providing for a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to certain retail installment contracts and leases for vehicles; providing for a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1146 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1146 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-17 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-16 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
DEBT
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Business & Commerce--General
DEBT
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General