TX SB1050 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operation of a health care quality provider participation program; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operation of a health care quality provider participation program; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Finance
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3342 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback