TX SB1046 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sources of funding for the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Title
Relating to sources of funding for the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS MOBILITY FUND
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS MOBILITY FUND
VEHICLE EMISSIONS