TX SB1045 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the consolidation of public notice requirements for certain air quality permit applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the consolidation of public notice requirements for certain air quality permit applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1423 (Y: 104 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1399 (Y: 87 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1398 (Y: 77 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1397 (Y: 60 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed
2017-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAmendment tabled
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-05SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenatePassed
2017-04-05SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-23SenateFiled
2017-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1045
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01045I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01045S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01045E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01045H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01045F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-05-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1045&RcdVtNo=1397&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1045&RcdVtNo=1398&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1045&RcdVtNo=1399&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1045&RcdVtNo=1423&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017

Bill Comments

feedback