TX SB1033 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorization for the conveyance of certain real property from Texas Tech University to Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorization for the conveyance of certain real property from Texas Tech University to Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1252 (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Postponed RV#1198 (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Effective immediately
2017-05-23 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-16SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-16SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15HouseRecord vote
2017-05-15HousePassed
2017-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-12HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePostponed
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-19HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-04-19HouseRead first time
2017-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-28SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenatePassed
2017-03-28SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-22SenateFiled
2017-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback