TX SB1024 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of certain lighting equipment on airport security vehicles.
Title
Relating to the use of certain lighting equipment on airport security vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AIRPORTS
EMERGENCY VEHICLES
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
EMERGENCY VEHICLES
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment