TX SB1021 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operations of the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact waste disposal facility.
Title
Relating to the operations of the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact waste disposal facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2269 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars