TX SB1016 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Agriculture and the Prescribed Burning Board, the creation of the Texas Bioenergy Policy Council and Texas Bioenergy Research Committee, and the abolition of the Texas-Israel Exchange Fund Board; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Agriculture and the Prescribed Burning Board, the creation of the Texas Bioenergy Policy Council and Texas Bioenergy Research Committee, and the abolition of the Texas-Israel Exchange Fund Board; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-26 | Read | |
2009-05-26 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-21 | Amended | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-20 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-08 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Passed | |
2009-04-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-16 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-16 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-04-16 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-16 | Amended | |
2009-04-16 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-16 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3236 (Same As) 2009-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
AGRICULTURAL FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
BIOENERGY POLICY COUNCIL
BIOENERGY RESEARCH COMMITTEE
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRESCRIBED BURNING BOARD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset Bills
TEXAS-ISRAEL EXCHANGE FUND BOARD
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
BIOENERGY POLICY COUNCIL
BIOENERGY RESEARCH COMMITTEE
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRESCRIBED BURNING BOARD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset Bills
TEXAS-ISRAEL EXCHANGE FUND BOARD