TX SB1014 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to facilities of the hospital system of the Reagan Hospital District of Reagan County, Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to facilities of the hospital system of the Reagan Hospital District of Reagan County, Texas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2318 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback