TX SB1007 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the practices and professions regulated by the Texas Appraiser Licensing and Certification Board.
Title
Relating to the practices and professions regulated by the Texas Appraiser Licensing and Certification Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - SB 1007Third Reading House (Y: 114 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - SB 1007Third Reading House (Y: 109 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - SB 1007Third Reading House (Y: 109 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Effective on 1/1/16 | |
2015-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-23 | House | Resumed consideration |
2015-05-23 | House | Point of order sustained |
2015-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
APPRAISER LICENSING & CERTIFICATION BOARD, TEXAS
Governor
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
Governor
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION