TX SB1004 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the deployment of network nodes in public right-of-way; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the deployment of network nodes in public right-of-way; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1321 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1312 (Y: 26 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HousePassed
2017-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17HouseRecord vote
2017-05-17HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-17HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-06SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-06SenateRecord vote
2017-04-06SenatePassed
2017-04-06SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-06SenateRecord vote
2017-04-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-06SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-06SenateAmended
2017-04-06SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-06SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-22SenateFiled
2017-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1004
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01004I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01004S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01004E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01004H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01004F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-06-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-06-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1004&RcdVtNo=1312&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1004&RcdVtNo=1321&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=278

Bill Comments

feedback