TX SB10 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-16)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Texas Mental Health Care Consortium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Texas Mental Health Care Consortium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-05SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-05SenateRecord vote
2019-03-05SenatePassed
2019-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-05SenateRecord vote
2019-03-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-05SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-05SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Hughes
2019-03-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-05SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Hall
2019-03-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-05SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-02-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-02-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-02-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-02-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-05SenateFiled
2019-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1448 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects

BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
Courts
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
DELL MEDICAL SCHOOL AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MENTAL HEALTH CARE CONSORTIUM, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
SUPREME COURT
TELEMEDICINE
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER AT EL PASO
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT FT. WORTH
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT SAN ANTONIO
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT TYLER
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MD ANDERSON CANCER CENTER
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MEDICAL BRANCH AT GALVESTON
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS RIO GRANDE VALLEY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER

Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback