TX SB10 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


Relating to the prosecution of offenses against public administration, including ethics offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the prosecution of offenses against public administration, including ethics offenses.



2015-05-27HousePoint of order sustained
2015-05-27HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-26HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-22HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-19HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2015-05-14HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2015-05-14HouseRead first time
2015-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenatePassed as amended
2015-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-09SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-08SenateRecord vote
2015-04-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-04-08SenateRecord vote
2015-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-08SenateRecord vote
2015-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-04SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-03-04SenateRead first time
2015-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments