TX SB1 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to election integrity and security, including by preventing fraud in the conduct of elections in this state; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses; providing civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to election integrity and security, including by preventing fraud in the conduct of elections in this state; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses; providing civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - FA11 Paxton (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - FA10 Campbell (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Senate - FA8 Bettencourt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Senate - FA4 Birdwell (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - FA3 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - FA2 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-13SenateReported engrossed
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenatePassed
2021-07-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA12 Zaffirini
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmended
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA11 Paxton
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmended
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA10 Campbell
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA9 Zaffirini
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmended
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA8 Bettencourt
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA7 Zaffirini
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA6 Zaffirini
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Zaffirini
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmended
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Birdwell
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmended
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Hughes
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateAmended
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes
2021-07-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-07-13SenateAmended
2021-07-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-07-13SenateRead 2nd time
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-07-13SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-07-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-07-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-07-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-07-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-07-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-07-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-07-08SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-07-08SenateRead first time
2021-07-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-08SenateFiled
2021-07-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=871&Bill=SB1
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00001I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00001S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00001E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F3.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F4.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F5.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F6.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F7.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F8.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F9.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F10.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F11.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00001S2F12.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/analysis/html/SB00001I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/fiscalnotes/html/SB00001I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/fiscalnotes/html/SB00001S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/analysis/html/SB00001S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=9

Bill Comments

feedback