TX SB1 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-11)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-11)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain restrictions on the imposition of ad valorem taxes and to the duty of the state to reimburse certain political subdivisions for certain revenue loss; making conforming changes.
Title
Relating to certain restrictions on the imposition of ad valorem taxes and to the duty of the state to reimburse certain political subdivisions for certain revenue loss; making conforming changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-25 - House - SB 1Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - SB 1Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 9 by King, Ken (Y: 53 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 8 by King, Ken (Y: 38 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Thompson, Senfronia (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - House - SB 1Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - SB 1Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 9 by King, Ken (Y: 53 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 8 by King, Ken (Y: 38 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Thompson, Senfronia (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - House - SB 1Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | See remarks for effective date | |
2015-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed |
2015-05-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-25 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2015-05-24 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR1 (Enabling for) 2015-06-01 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--School District
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--School District