TX HR987 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Mary Louise Smith of Pflugerville on her retirement from Texas Health and Human Services.
Title
Congratulating Mary Louise Smith of Pflugerville on her retirement from Texas Health and Human Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |