TX HR97 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 170th anniversary of the signing of the Treaty of Guadalupe Hidalgo.
Title
Commemorating the 170th anniversary of the signing of the Treaty of Guadalupe Hidalgo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TREATY OF GUADALUPE HIDALGO
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TREATY OF GUADALUPE HIDALGO