TX HR945 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Sierra Francis of McKinney on winning the Heifer Superintendent's Beef Challenge at the 2013 Fort Worth Stock Show and Rodeo.
Title
Congratulating Sierra Francis of McKinney on winning the Heifer Superintendent's Beef Challenge at the 2013 Fort Worth Stock Show and Rodeo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed |