TX HR91 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Paying tribute to the life of Irma Rangel and honoring the students of the Irma Lerma Rangel Young Women's Leadership School in 2015-2016, on the 12th anniversary of the opening of the school.
Title
Paying tribute to the life of Irma Rangel and honoring the students of the Irma Lerma Rangel Young Women's Leadership School in 2015-2016, on the 12th anniversary of the opening of the school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2014-12-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
IRMA LERMA RANGEL YOUNG WOMEN'S LEADERSHIP SCHOOL
RANGEL, IRMA, REP.
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
RANGEL, IRMA, REP.
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary