TX HR906 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-01 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-01 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Commending David and Dain Guetersloh of GB Aerial Applications, Inc., for their service as pilots and firefighters.
Title
Commending David and Dain Guetersloh of GB Aerial Applications, Inc., for their service as pilots and firefighters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-30 | Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |