TX HR88 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Kayla Wilhelm, valedictorian of the Holy Cross Catholic Academy Class of 2017.
Title
Congratulating Kayla Wilhelm, valedictorian of the Holy Cross Catholic Academy Class of 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-07-24 | House | Filed |