TX HR873 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Eli and Vicky Clifton on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Eli and Vicky Clifton on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-13 | House | Filed |