TX HR824 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Earl Maxwell on his retirement as CEO of the St. David's Foundation.
Title
Congratulating Earl Maxwell on his retirement as CEO of the St. David's Foundation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed |