TX HR814 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Red Oak Independent School District for its service to area youth.
Title
Honoring the Red Oak Independent School District for its service to area youth.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Ellzey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Filed |