TX HR808 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the landmark Supreme Court decision in Gideon v. Wainwright.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the landmark Supreme Court decision in Gideon v. Wainwright.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-18 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |