TX HR788 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Harold Kenneth Elliott.
Title
In memory of Harold Kenneth Elliott.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] |
Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-21 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |