TX HR783 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dr. George N. Smith on being named Family Physician of the Year by the American College of Osteopathic Family Physicians.
Title
Congratulating Dr. George N. Smith on being named Family Physician of the Year by the American College of Osteopathic Family Physicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |