TX HR77 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Hanks High School unified floorball team for qualifying for the 2022 Special Olympics World Winter Games.
Title
Congratulating the Hanks High School unified floorball team for qualifying for the 2022 Special Olympics World Winter Games.
Sponsors
Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |