TX HR755 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the founding members of the Cooke County Republican Women and congratulating the CCRW on its 25th anniversary.
Title
Honoring the founding members of the Cooke County Republican Women and congratulating the CCRW on its 25th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |