TX HR750 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 6, 2017, as United States Tennis Association (USTA) Texas Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 6, 2017, as United States Tennis Association (USTA) Texas Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
UNITED STATES TENNIS ASSOCIATION TEXAS DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
UNITED STATES TENNIS ASSOCIATION TEXAS DAY