TX HR744 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Paula Harris on being elected president of the Houston Independent School District Board of Education.
Title
Honoring Paula Harris on being elected president of the Houston Independent School District Board of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-17 | Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Laid before the House | |
2011-03-17 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |