TX HR741 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Rockport Police Department on its recognition by the Texas Police Chiefs Association.
Title
Congratulating the Rockport Police Department on its recognition by the Texas Police Chiefs Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Filed |