TX HR74 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 75th anniversary of the Kaufman Lions Club youth baseball and softball program.
Title
Commemorating the 75th anniversary of the Kaufman Lions Club youth baseball and softball program.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-08-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-08-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-08-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-08-30 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-23 | House | Filed |