TX HR73 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the 2018 and former presidents of the Mexican American Democrats of Texas.
Title
Honoring the 2018 and former presidents of the Mexican American Democrats of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed |