TX HR725 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dalvin and Gladys Awalt of Midland on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Dalvin and Gladys Awalt of Midland on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |