TX HR723 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 8, 2017, as Parkland Health & Hospital System Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 8, 2017, as Parkland Health & Hospital System Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PARKLAND HEALTH & HOSPITAL SYSTEM DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates