TX HR70 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Herbert David Kelleher, cofounder of Southwest Airlines.
Title
In memory of Herbert David Kelleher, cofounder of Southwest Airlines.
Sponsors
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. John Turner [D] |
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |