TX HR678 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 1, 2017, as Grand Prairie Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 1, 2017, as Grand Prairie Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Anderson [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-01 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GRAND PRAIRIE DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates