TX HR677 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating George Flint on his election as chair of the Collin County GOP.
Title
Congratulating George Flint on his election as chair of the Collin County GOP.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |