TX HR672 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing members of the Austin Area Life Affirming Coalition who are visiting the State Capitol on March 10, 2009.
Title
Recognizing members of the Austin Area Life Affirming Coalition who are visiting the State Capitol on March 10, 2009.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Gattis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-10 | Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |