TX HR658 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Welcoming members of the West I-10 Chamber of Commerce to the State Capitol.
Title
Welcoming members of the West I-10 Chamber of Commerce to the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-24 | Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the House | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |