TX HR626 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Larry Lamb, the Hill Country 100 Club Officer of the Year for the Burnet Police Department.
Title
Congratulating Larry Lamb, the Hill Country 100 Club Officer of the Year for the Burnet Police Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |