TX HR614 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 27, 2013, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 27, 2013, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PEARLAND DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates