TX HR61 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the African American Museum on 25 years at Fair Park in Dallas.
Title
Congratulating the African American Museum on 25 years at Fair Park in Dallas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed |