TX HR60 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the 2014 and former presidents of the Mexican American Democrats of Texas.
Title
Honoring the 2014 and former presidents of the Mexican American Democrats of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-02-18 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-01-07 | House | Filed |