TX HR594 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Manuel M. Carrillo on his retirement from Sul Ross State University.
Title
Congratulating Manuel M. Carrillo on his retirement from Sul Ross State University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-05 | Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | Laid before the House | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-03 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |